IL HR0897 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares intent to eradicate abuse, neglect, and financial exploitation of people with disabilities in Illinois.
Title
SCREEN DISABLED FOR ABUSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-05-17 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-18 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=897&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0897.htm |