IL HR0897 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Shows support for efforts to ensure that students from Illinois have access to debt-free higher education at public colleges and universities.
Title
DEBT-FREE HIGHER EDUCATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-12-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=897&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0897.htm |