IL HR0896 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-0)
Status: Passed on November 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mourns the passing of LeRoy Franklin Lilly.
Title
MEMORIAL-LEROY F. LILLY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2022-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2022-08-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2022-08-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-08-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-07-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-07-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-07-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2022-07-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=896&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0896.htm |