IL HR0893 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares March 27, 2018, the 116th anniversary of the passing of Rabbi Menachem Mendel Schneerson, the Lubavitcher Rebbe, as "Education and Sharing Day" in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION & SHARING DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-25HouseRecommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-03-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback