IL HR0891 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Helene Miller Walsh
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

States the belief that the Illinois Constitution should not be amended to permit a graduated income tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OPPOSES GRADUATED INCOME TAX

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Helene Miller Walsh
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-03-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-03-02HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback