IL HR0887 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Admonishes the Humane Society of the United States for their misleading practices, including their disrespectful work culture and lack of commitment to supporting animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HUMANE SOCIETY WORK CULTURE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-03-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-03-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback