IL HR0886 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Resolution Adopted 055-044-001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the members of the U.S. Congress not to enact the President Trump's infrastructure plan and to work to develop a plan that provides equitable assistance to state and local units of government for infrastructure funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FED INFRASTRUCTURE PLAN-OPPOSE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - House - Motion in House (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 15 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseResolution Adopted 055-044-001
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-09HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-003-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback