IL HR0885 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Illinois Department of Corrections to strengthen its commitment to PREA and eradicate sexual harassment and abuse in correctional facilities in Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDOC COMMITMENT TO PREA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback