IL HR0885 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Department of Corrections to strengthen its commitment to PREA and eradicate sexual harassment and abuse in correctional facilities in Illinois.
Title
IDOC COMMITMENT TO PREA
Sponsors
Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Juliana Stratton [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] |
Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-17 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=885&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0885.htm |