IL HR0881 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - Resolution Adopted 103-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - Resolution Adopted 103-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates March 9, 2014 as Marvin E. Wiley Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
MARVIN E. WILEY DAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-09 - House - Motion in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-09 | House | Resolution Adopted 103-000-000 |
2014-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-03-20 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 018-000-000 |
2014-03-13 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |