IL HR0877 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges congressional representatives to take steps to establish a system of check and balances with regard to the first use of nuclear weapons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

NUCLEAR WEAPONS SYSTEM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-24HouseRecommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 007-004-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback