IL HR0877 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Commends the members of Congress of the United States who have called for the expansion and completion of the Keystone XL pipeline system, calls upon the President of the United States to speed up the process of granting the final permits to enable construction to begin on the completion of the Keystone XL pipeline, and requests that the United States Department of Defense make a public statement as to the desirability of maximizing the production of fossil fuels within the boundaries of North America as part of our overall worldwide strategic position.
Title
KEYSTONE PIPELINE-EXPANSION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-07-27 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-07-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Nybo |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ren |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Barickman |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment & Energy Committee |
2012-03-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David Reis |
2012-03-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-03-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. David Reis |
2012-03-27 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
2012-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott E. Penny |
2012-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2012-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-03-26 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2012-03-26 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Environment & Energy Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-03-26 | House | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Evans |
2012-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |