IL HR0876 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges counties to cease relying to such a great extent on fines and fees imposed on those who have committed a criminal offense to offset other costs within the county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EXCESSIVE CRIMINAL FINES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback