IL HR0875 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Calls on policymakers at every level of state government to pursue policies that prioritize the expeditious replacement of all remaining lead-based water infrastructure in Illinois. Declares support and encourages municipalities and all other providers of water service to pursue the full range of options for assuring that water infrastructure in Illinois is as safe, modern, and as accessible as possible. Supports plans to provide water in emergency situations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFE WATER INFRASTRUCTURE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Environment; 014-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Environment
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback