IL HR0874 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the President of the United States and Members of the United States Congress, and all relevant federal offices to continue to protect net neutrality and open Internet access.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROTECT NET NEUTRALITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-20HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-19HouseRecommends Be Adopted Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2018-03-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback