IL HR0868 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes Chronic Obstructive Pulmonary Disorder (COPD) as a chronic health condition in Illinois. Urges the Illinois Department of Public Health to include COPD as a chronic health condition in its efforts to address serious and chronic health conditions in Illinois by seeking out and applying for funding and grants available to provide public awareness or treatment for COPD. Urges the Illinois Department of Public Health to include COPD as a chronic health condition in its current efforts to educate the public about the effects of smoking or other preventable and treatable chronic health conditions. Designates November of 2014 as COPD Awareness Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
COPD AWARENESS/INITIATIVES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-05-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2014-05-01 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-03-26 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2014-03-06 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=868&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HR/09800HR0868.htm |