IL HR0865 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encourages every school district in the State of Illinois and the heads of each school in this State, in collaboration with local law enforcement, to begin exploring and implementing the necessary modern response training programs and innovative procedures that are designed to help prevent the loss of life in the event of an on-campus emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ON-CAMPUS SAFETY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-05-17HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-18HouseRecommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-02-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback