IL HR0865 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages every school district in the State of Illinois and the heads of each school in this State, in collaboration with local law enforcement, to begin exploring and implementing the necessary modern response training programs and innovative procedures that are designed to help prevent the loss of life in the event of an on-campus emergency.
Title
ON-CAMPUS SAFETY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-17 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-04-18 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-02-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=865&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0865.htm |