IL HR0861 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to develop the 2012 Farm Bill with a strong Title IV that protects and strengthens federal food and nutrition programs.
Title
URGE CONGRESS - 2012 FARM BILL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2012-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2012-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andr |
2012-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2012-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons |
2012-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2012-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2012-04-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2012-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2012-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Biss |
2012-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2012-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2012-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2012-03-22 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2012-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=861&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR0861.htm |