IL HR0851 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Believes students may benefit from full-day kindergarten programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SUPPORT FULL DAY KINDERGARTEN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-05-17HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-18HouseRecommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback