IL HR0849 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the month of April 2018 as Child Abuse Prevention Month in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILD ABUSE PREVENTION MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback