IL HR0847 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Governor Rauner and Secretary of State White to direct all State agencies to explore ways to reduce energy consumption in state facilities, and to adopt a policy and procedure for turning off all non-essential lights at the end of the day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENERGY USAGE-STATE BUILDINGS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-18HouseRecommends Be Adopted Energy Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Energy Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback