IL HR0847 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Governor Rauner and Secretary of State White to direct all State agencies to explore ways to reduce energy consumption in state facilities, and to adopt a policy and procedure for turning off all non-essential lights at the end of the day.
Title
ENERGY USAGE-STATE BUILDINGS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-05-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-18 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Energy Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Energy Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=847&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0847.htm |