IL HR0846 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares the date of June 15, 2018 as Elder Abuse Awareness Day in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELDER ABUSE AWARENESS DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-17HouseRecommends Be Adopted Aging Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Aging Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback