IL HR0846 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the date of June 15, 2018 as Elder Abuse Awareness Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
ELDER ABUSE AWARENESS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-05-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-17 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Aging Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Aging Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David S. Olsen |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=846&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0846.htm |