IL HR0841 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes February 2018 as "School-Based Health Center Awareness Month" and encourages all Illinoisans to join in this observance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL-BASED HEALTH CARE MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-12HouseRecommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-03HouseRe-assigned to Mental Health Committee
2018-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback