IL HR0837 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the U.S. Census Bureau to not reinstate the citizenship question to the 2020 census.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

US CENSUS-CITIZENSHIP QUESTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - Motion in House (Y: 54 N: 46 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted 054-046-001
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 006-004-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-02-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback