IL HR0830 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Department of Natural Resources to explore ways to finance the renovation of the Eternal Indian statue at Lowden State Park in order to preserve a treasured Illinois monument for generations to come.
Title
RENOVATE ETERNAL INDIAN STATUE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-03-06 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=830&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0830.htm |