IL HR0826 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Illinois Secretary of State to implement a statewide electronic lien and title system.
Title
STATEWIDE ELEC LIEN AND TITLE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-25 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John C. D'Amico |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=826&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0826.htm |