IL HR0818 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct an audit of 3 State facility cafeterias to report on the amount of food that has been disposed of and make recommendations on serving and ordering that will reduce wasted food at State facilities.
Title
AUDITOR GENL-WASTED FOOD AUDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-12 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 005-002-000 |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=818&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0818.htm |