IL HR0816 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted 104-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the Auditor General to conduct a performance audit on the Department of Central Management Services to review and assess whether the Department's automated multiple choice exams for State employment are racially biased.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AUDITOR GENERAL-CMS TESTING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted 104-000-000
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-18HouseRecommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback