IL HR0812 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes the critical importance that viral load suppression plays in improving health outcomes and reducing HIV transmission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIV VIRAL LOAD SUPPRESSION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseResolution Adopted
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-18HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback