IL HR0809 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges all first responders, law enforcement, and public health officials to be educated about the dangers of exposure to Fentanyl or its analogues.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FENTANYL EXPOSURE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-08HouseResolution Adopted
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-03-01HouseRecommends Be Adopted Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback