IL HR0808 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

States opposition to the State Board of Education hiring three public relations professionals to serve as "Storytellers".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ISBE-NO STORYTELLERS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-05-15HouseRecommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 013-003-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2018-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback