IL HR0802 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the federal government, the United States Congress, and the President of the United States to restore the cut funding to the 340B Drug Discount Program and Medicaid's Disproportionate Share Hospital program to protect healthcare for low-income and at-risk populations.
Title
DRUG DISCOUNT FUNDS-RESTORE
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-04-05 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=802&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0802.htm |