IL HR0798 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Congress to establish federal paid parental leave at no additional cost by allowing new parents to defer collection of Social Security benefits upon retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PAID PARENTAL LEAVE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseRemains in Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-02-28HouseRecommends Be Adopted - Lost Labor & Commerce Committee; 011-012-000
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-05HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback