IL HR0798 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to establish federal paid parental leave at no additional cost by allowing new parents to defer collection of Social Security benefits upon retirement.
Title
PAID PARENTAL LEAVE
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Breen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Remains in Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Labor & Commerce Committee; 011-012-000 |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=798&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0798.htm |