IL HR0796 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Encourages the General Assembly to pass legislation that requires Chicago Public Schools board members, who are currently appointed by the Mayor of Chicago, to be elected by the people.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CPS BOARD-ELECTED

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-07HouseRecommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2018-02-13HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback