IL HR0795 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the State of Illinois to make school climate and culture a priority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCHOOL CLIMATE AND CULTURE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-18HouseRecommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback