IL HR0792 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares February 28, 2018 as Rare Disease Day in Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RARE DISEASE DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback