IL HR0790 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges that home economics be brought back into high school curriculums with a comprehensive approach covering basic cooking techniques, caloric requirements, sources of food, budget principles, food safety, and effects of food on well-being and risk for chronic disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HOME ECONOMICS-HIGH SCHOOL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-04-18HouseRecommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000
2018-04-03HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback