IL HR0789 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the Lake County High Schools Technology Campus to change its name to the Lake County College and Career Center with the goal to change the mentality of career and technical education and encourage attending students to pursue careers or college after graduation.
Title
LAKE COUNTY-TECH CAMPUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=789&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0789.htm |