IL HR0787 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-13)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares April 10, 2018 as Pay Equity Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PAY EQUITY DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-02-28HouseRecommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 021-000-000
2018-02-12HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-01-31HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-01-31HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-01-31HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-01-31HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback