IL HR0784 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the United States Department of Transportation to make funding for the Chicago Red line extension a priority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RED LINE EXTENSION-FUNDING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-05-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-03-06HouseRecommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback