IL HR0784 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Department of Transportation to make funding for the Chicago Red line extension a priority.
Title
RED LINE EXTENSION-FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-05-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-03-06 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=784&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0784.htm |