IL HR0783 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, the Illinois Department of Human Rights, and the U.S. Department of Labor to investigate the culture of harassment within the U.A.W. and provide increased support for the brave women who have detailed their experiences within the Ford Motor Company.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FORD/UAW SEXUAL HARASSMENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-10HouseResolution Adopted
2018-04-27HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-02-28HouseRecommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-02-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-02-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-01-31HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-01-31HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-01-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-01-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback