IL HR0783 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, the Illinois Department of Human Rights, and the U.S. Department of Labor to investigate the culture of harassment within the U.A.W. and provide increased support for the brave women who have detailed their experiences within the Ford Motor Company.
Title
FORD/UAW SEXUAL HARASSMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-05-10 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2018-04-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2018-02-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-02-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-01-31 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-01-31 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-01-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=783&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HR/10000HR0783.htm |