IL HR0781 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares August 2022 as Spinal Muscular Atrophy Awareness Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
SPINAL ATROPHY AWARENESS MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2022-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-04-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2022-04-08 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-03-31 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Swanson |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=781&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0781.htm |