IL HR0774 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares May 1, 2018 as "Lyme Disease Awareness Day" in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LYME DISEASE AWARENESS DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-02-13HouseResolution Adopted
2018-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2018-02-07HouseRecommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-01-30HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-01-24HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback