IL HR0773 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares support for the City of Elgin and the Coalition to Stop CPKC in their opposition to the merger of the Canadian Pacific and Kansas City Southern railroads. Urges the Federal Surface Transportation Board to reject the CPKC merger application.
Title
COALITION TO STOP CPKC-SUPPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | To Roadways, Rail & Aviation Subcommittee |
2022-03-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-03-30 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=773&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0773.htm |